NC H554 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Ch. SL 2019-207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Funeral Practice Licensure Tech. Corrections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funeral Practice Licensure Tech. Corrections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-20 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 83 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - A1 Boles Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30 Ch. SL 2019-207
2019-08-30 Signed by Gov. 8/30/2019
2019-08-22 Pres. To Gov. 8/22/2019
2019-08-21 Ratified
2019-08-20HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-20HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-08-19HousePlaced On Cal For 08/20/2019
2019-08-19HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-07-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-29HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-24HousePlaced On Cal For 07/29/2019
2019-07-24HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-24HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-24SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-23SenateEngrossed
2019-07-23SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-23SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-23SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-22SenateReptd Fav
2019-07-08SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-08SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-07-08SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-28SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-28SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-28SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-28SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-27SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-06-27SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-27SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-19SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-19SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-29SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-26HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-25HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-04-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-25HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-04-18HousePlaced On Cal For 04/25/2019
2019-04-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-18HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-04-16HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-16HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-03HouseRef to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-03HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H554
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H554v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H554v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H554v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H554v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H554v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H554v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H554v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H554v7.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H554v8.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H554v9.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/209
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/208
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/520
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/519
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/764

Bill Comments

feedback