NC H553 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Licensing Certain Fire Safety Equip. Work

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing Certain Fire Safety Equip. Work

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-13SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-13SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-06-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-10HousePlaced On Cal For 06/11/2019
2019-06-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-10HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2019-06-05HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-05HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-04-11HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-04-11HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-03HouseRef to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-03HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S519 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback