NC H55 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Ch. SL 2017-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Ch. SL 2017-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Apex/Cary/Police Assistance on School Grounds
Title
Apex/Cary/Police Assistance on School Grounds
Sponsors
Sen. Gale Adcock [D] | Rep. Linda Hunt Williams [R] | Rep. Nelson Dollar [R] | Rep. Duane Hall [D] |
Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Rosa Gill [D] | Rep. Darren Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Ch. SL 2017-34 | |
2017-06-19 | Ratified | |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-09 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-03-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-02-08 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government II |
2017-02-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed |