NC H547 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Use Law Enf. Decert Index
Title
Use Law Enf. Decert Index
Sponsors
Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. Kristin Baker [R] | Rep. Howard Hunter [D] | Rep. Susan Fisher [D] |
Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] | Rep. Evelyn Terry [D] |
Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Cje & Training Standards Comn.
Commissions
Data & Records Systems
Emergency Services
Employment
Information Technology
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Licensing & Certification
Occupations
Personnel
Public
Records
Sheriff's Training Comn.
Sheriffs
Commissions
Data & Records Systems
Emergency Services
Employment
Information Technology
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Licensing & Certification
Occupations
Personnel
Public
Records
Sheriff's Training Comn.
Sheriffs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
17C | 6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
17E | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
17E | 4 | (n/a) | Citation Text |