NC H546 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Re-ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Re-ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
NC Call Center Preservation Act
Title
NC Call Center Preservation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-15 | House | Serial Referral To Regulatory Reform Stricken |
2021-04-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Colleges & Universities
Commerce
Community Colleges
Community Colleges Office
Corporations
Council Of State
Economic Development
For-profit
Higher Education
Labor Commissioner
Labor Dept.
Public
Public Officials
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Commerce
Community Colleges
Community Colleges Office
Corporations
Council Of State
Economic Development
For-profit
Higher Education
Labor Commissioner
Labor Dept.
Public
Public Officials
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
95 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
95 | 31.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H546 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H546v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H546v1.pdf |