NC H546 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - Ch. SL 2019-155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - Ch. SL 2019-155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit Counterfeit/Nonfunctional Airbags
Title
Prohibit Counterfeit/Nonfunctional Airbags
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-10 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | Ch. SL 2019-155 | |
2019-07-22 | Signed by Gov. 7/22/2019 | |
2019-07-12 | Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019 | |
2019-07-11 | Ratified | |
2019-07-10 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-10 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2019-07-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/10/2019 |
2019-07-09 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-07-09 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2019 |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-17 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-04-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-03 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S589 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate