NC H546 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Alternative Salary Plans/Charlotte-Meck. Sch
Title
Alternative Salary Plans/Charlotte-Meck. Sch
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-05-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-29 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-27 | Placed On Cal For 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-11 | Re-ref Com On Education | |
2011-04-11 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-31 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-03-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-30 | Filed |