NC H545 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Mandatory Training Contributing to CEUs
Title
Mandatory Training Contributing to CEUs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-04-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education Administration
Employment
Government Employees
Licensing & Certification
Occupations
Professional Education
Public
State Employees
Teachers
Education Administration
Employment
Government Employees
Licensing & Certification
Occupations
Professional Education
Public
State Employees
Teachers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 270.30 | (n/a) | Citation Text |