NC H544 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise Animal Fighting Laws
Title
Revise Animal Fighting Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
Animal Control
Animal Welfare
Animals
Crimes
Domestic Animals
Gaming
Livestock & Poultry
Minors
Public
Public Health
Animal Control
Animal Welfare
Animals
Crimes
Domestic Animals
Gaming
Livestock & Poultry
Minors
Public
Public Health
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
14 | 362 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 362.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 362.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |