NC H533 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
County Waste Management Assistance
Title
County Waste Management Assistance
Sponsors
Rep. John Sauls [R] | Rep. Howard Penny [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2022-06-28 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2022-06-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2022-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S529 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Budgeting
Counties
Deq
Environment
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Local Government
Motor Vehicles
Public
Reporting
Tires
Waste Management
Counties
Deq
Environment
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Local Government
Motor Vehicles
Public
Reporting
Tires
Waste Management
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
105 | 187.19 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
130A | 309.06 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 309.09C | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 309.54 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 309.58 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 309.63 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 309.64 | (n/a) | Citation Text |