NC H532 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Ch. SL 2017-117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Ch. SL 2017-117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modify UNC Laboratory Schools
Title
Modify UNC Laboratory Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Rep. Linda Johnson [R] | Rep. John Fraley [R] | Rep. Mary Belk [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | Ch. SL 2017-117 | |
2017-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2017 | |
2017-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2017 | |
2017-06-27 | Ratified | |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-30 | House | Ref To Com On Education - Universities |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S461 (Same As) 2017-04-19 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget