NC H531 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Timeshare Act Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Timeshare Act Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-06HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-05HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-05HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-04HousePlaced On Cal For 05/05/2021
2021-05-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-04HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-28HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-28HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-13HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
47C(n/a)Citation Text
47C1-103(n/a)Citation Text
53(n/a)Citation Text
53244.030(n/a)Citation Text
66(n/a)Citation Text
66232(n/a)Citation Text
93A(n/a)Citation Text
93A34(n/a)Citation Text
93A36(n/a)Citation Text
93A39(n/a)Citation Text
93A40(n/a)Citation Text
93A41(n/a)Citation Text
93A42(n/a)Citation Text
93A42.1(n/a)Citation Text
93A43(n/a)Citation Text
93A44(n/a)Citation Text
93A45(n/a)Citation Text
93A46(n/a)Citation Text
93A47(n/a)Citation Text
93A48(n/a)Citation Text
93A49(n/a)Citation Text
93A50(n/a)Citation Text
93A51(n/a)Citation Text
93A52(n/a)Citation Text
93A53(n/a)Citation Text
93A54(n/a)Citation Text
93A55(n/a)Citation Text
93A56(n/a)Citation Text
93A57(n/a)Citation Text
93A58(n/a)Citation Text
93A59(n/a)Citation Text
93A60(n/a)Citation Text
93A61(n/a)Citation Text
93A62(n/a)Citation Text
93A63(n/a)Citation Text
93A64(n/a)Citation Text
93A65(n/a)Citation Text
93A66(n/a)Citation Text
93A67(n/a)Citation Text
93A68(n/a)Citation Text
93A69(n/a)Citation Text
93A69.1(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback