NC H530 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Ch. SL 2017-109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Ch. SL 2017-109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Counties/Condemnation of Unsafe Bldgs/Liens
Title
Counties/Condemnation of Unsafe Bldgs/Liens
Sponsors
Rep. David Lewis [R] | Rep. John Sauls [R] | Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] | Rep. Mary Belk [D] |
Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Ch. SL 2017-109 | |
2017-07-12 | Signed by Gov. 7/12/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-20 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-19 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-19 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-05 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary III Stricken |
2017-03-30 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Judiciary III |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Filed |