NC H522 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Ch. SL 2021-94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Modify Service/Release of Alternate Jurors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify Service/Release of Alternate Jurors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-15 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-22 Ch. SL 2021-94
2021-07-22 Signed by Gov. 7/22/2021
2021-07-20 Pres. To Gov. 7/20/2021
2021-07-19 Ratified
2021-07-15HouseOrdered Enrolled
2021-07-15HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2021-07-15HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-07-15HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2021-07-14HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2021-07-14SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-07-13SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-07-13SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-07-12SenateReptd Fav
2021-06-23SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-23SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-06-23SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-06-14SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-12SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-12SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-12SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-10HousePlaced On Cal For 05/11/2021
2021-05-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-10HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-28HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-28HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-12HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-12HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15A(n/a)Citation Text
15A1215(n/a)Citation Text
15A1221(n/a)Citation Text
15A1340.16(n/a)Citation Text
20179(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H522
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H522v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H522v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H522v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H522v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H522v4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52261/0/H522-PCS10514-TU-15
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H522-SMCH-25(e1)-v-6
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H522-SMTU-55(e1)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H522-SMTU-57(e2)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H522-SMTU-89(sl)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/278
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/341
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/443

Bill Comments

feedback