NC H521 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Transitional License/Teacher from Other State

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transitional License/Teacher from Other State

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-12SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-29SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-26HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-18HousePlaced On Cal For 04/25/2019
2019-04-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-18HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-16HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-16HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-01HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S393 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback