NC H515 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adaptive Equipment Tax Benefit
Title
Adaptive Equipment Tax Benefit
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. Donna White [R] | Rep. George Graham [D] |
Sen. Gale Adcock [D] | Rep. Mary Belk [D] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. Rosa Gill [D] |
Rep. Charles Graham [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Bobbie Richardson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-05-24 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/23/2017 |
2017-05-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-29 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-28 | House | Filed |