NC H514 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Permit Municipal Charter School/Certain Towns

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permit Municipal Charter School/Certain Towns

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 64 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28HouseFiled
2017-03-29HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-29HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, State and Local Government II
2017-04-24HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-04-24HouseRe-ref Com On State and Local Government II
2017-04-25HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-25HousePlaced On Cal For 04/26/2017
2017-04-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-26HouseReconsidered 3rd Reading
2017-04-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-27HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-27SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2017-04-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-10-05SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-10-05SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-05-30SenateReptd Fav As Amended
2018-05-30SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-05-30SenateCom Amend Adpt & Engross 1
2018-05-30SenateSequential Referral To Pensions and Retirement and Aging Added
2018-05-30SenateReptd Fav
2018-05-30SenateRe-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement and Aging
2018-05-31SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-05-31SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2018-05-31SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-05-31SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-05-31SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/04/2018
2018-06-04SenateAmend Adopted A1
2018-06-04SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-04SenateEngrossed
2018-06-05SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2018-06-05HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2018-06-05HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-05HousePlaced On Cal For 06/06/2018
2018-06-06HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2018-06-06HouseOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-07 Ratified
2018-06-07 Ch. SL 2018-3

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H514&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H514v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H514v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H514v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H514v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H514v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H514v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H514v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H514v7.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=386
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=403
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=469
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=583
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=585
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=584
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1006

Bill Comments

feedback