NC H511 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Ch. SL 2020-47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

North Carolina First Step Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

North Carolina First Step Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26 Ch. SL 2020-47
2020-06-26 Signed by Gov. 6/26/2020
2020-06-17 Pres. To Gov. 6/17/2020
2020-06-17 Ratified
2020-06-17HouseOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-17HouseConf Report Adopted
2020-06-16SenateConf Report Adopted
2020-06-16SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-16HousePlaced On Cal For 06/17/2020
2020-06-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2020-06-16HouseConf Com Reported
2020-06-16SenateConf Com Reported
2020-06-16SenateConf Com Appointed
2020-06-11HouseConf Com Appointed
2020-06-11HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2020-06-11HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-06-11HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-10-24HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-10-23HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-10-23SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-10-22SenateEngrossed
2019-10-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-22SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-10-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 10/21/2019
2019-10-10SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-10-09SenateReptd Fav
2019-10-09SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-10-09SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-10-09SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-08-27SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-08-27SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-07-10SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-10SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-07-10SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-07-09SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-09SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-26SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-26SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-18SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-18SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-29SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-29HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-25HousePlaced On Cal For 04/26/2019
2019-04-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-01HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S417 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H511
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H511v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H511v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H511v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H511v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H511v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H511v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H511v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H511v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/213
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/613
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/612
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/756
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/970

Bill Comments

feedback