NC H51 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Official Azalea Festival
Title
Official Azalea Festival
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Davis [R] | Rep. John Bell [R] | Rep. Deb Butler [D] | Rep. Becky Carney [D] |
Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Holly Grange [R] | Rep. Francis Iler [R] | Rep. Donny Lambeth [R] |
Rep. David Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-03-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/20/2019 |
2019-03-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-03-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |