NC H502 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Voting Machines/Certain Cos

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting Machines/Certain Cos

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-29HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-25HouseRe-ref Com On State and Local Government
2019-04-25HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-01HouseRef to the Com on Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-27HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback