NC H500 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Disaster Relief and Mitigation Act of 2021
Title
Disaster Relief and Mitigation Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2021-06-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-26 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-12 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Environment, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Appropriations
Boards
Boiling Springs
Brunswick County
Budgeting
Building Codes
Buildings
Charitable Donations
Clean Water Trust Fund
Clean Water Trust Fund Board
Cleveland County
Coastal Resources
Committees
Community Development
Conservation
Contracts
Corporate Income
Corporations
Counties
Cultural Resources
Dams
Deq
Disasters & Emergencies
Emergency Management
Emergency Management Comm.
Emergency Services
Environment
For-profit
Forest Service
Forestry
Funding
Funds & Accounts
General Assembly
Government Employees
Grants
Infrastructure
Lakes & Rivers
Lumber River
Membership
Municipalities
Name Change
Natural & Cultural Resources Dept.
Neuse River
Nonprofit
Personnel
Pilot Programs
President Pro Tempore
Property
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Real Estate
Reporting
Roads & Highways
Session Laws
Southport
Speaker
State Employees
Tax Credits
Taxation
Taxes
Transportation
Transportation Dept.
Water Resources
Appropriations
Boards
Boiling Springs
Brunswick County
Budgeting
Building Codes
Buildings
Charitable Donations
Clean Water Trust Fund
Clean Water Trust Fund Board
Cleveland County
Coastal Resources
Committees
Community Development
Conservation
Contracts
Corporate Income
Corporations
Counties
Cultural Resources
Dams
Deq
Disasters & Emergencies
Emergency Management
Emergency Management Comm.
Emergency Services
Environment
For-profit
Forest Service
Forestry
Funding
Funds & Accounts
General Assembly
Government Employees
Grants
Infrastructure
Lakes & Rivers
Lumber River
Membership
Municipalities
Name Change
Natural & Cultural Resources Dept.
Neuse River
Nonprofit
Personnel
Pilot Programs
President Pro Tempore
Property
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Real Estate
Reporting
Roads & Highways
Session Laws
Southport
Speaker
State Employees
Tax Credits
Taxation
Taxes
Transportation
Transportation Dept.
Water Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | 70.150 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
120 | 70.151 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
120 | 70.152 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143 | 214.11A | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143B | 1040 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 135.234 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 135.244 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
166A | 19.12 | (n/a) | Citation Text |