NC H496 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Ch. SL 2018-99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Fair and Nonpartisan Ballot Placement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair and Nonpartisan Ballot Placement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 80 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 84 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26 Ch. SL 2018-99
2018-06-26HouseBecame Law W/o Signature
2018-06-15 Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
2018-06-14 Ratified
2018-06-13HouseOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-13HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2018-06-13HouseAdded to Calendar
2018-06-12HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-12HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2018-06-12SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2018-06-12SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-12SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-12SenateReptd Fav
2018-06-12SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-12SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2018-06-12SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-06-11SenateRe-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-11SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-26SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-26SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-26SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-04-26HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-25HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-04-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-25HouseReptd Fav
2017-04-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-04-25HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-03-28HouseRef To Com On Elections and Ethics Law
2017-03-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-27HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H496&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H496v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H496v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H496v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H496v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H496v4.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=355
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=619
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1141

Bill Comments

feedback