NC H492 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Simplify Builder Inventory Exclusion
Title
Simplify Builder Inventory Exclusion
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Rep. Julia Howard [R] | Rep. Brian Turner [D] | Rep. Nasif Majeed [D] |
Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Ch. SL 2019-123 | |
2019-07-19 | Signed by Gov. 7/19/2019 | |
2019-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2019 | |
2019-07-08 | Ratified | |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/02/2019 |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2019 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-03 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/02/2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-29 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2019-03-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Filed |