NC H49 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-26 - Referred To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-26 - Referred To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concealed Carry Permit Lapse/Revise Law
Title
Concealed Carry Permit Lapse/Revise Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 79 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 79 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-26 | House | Referred To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-07-11 | House | Received from the Governor |
2022-07-11 | Vetoed 07/11/2022 | |
2022-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2022 | |
2022-07-01 | Ratified | |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-03-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/10/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 3, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Concealed Carry
Counties
Law Enforcement
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Presented
Public
Ratified
Sheriffs
Vetoed
Weapons
Counties
Law Enforcement
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Presented
Public
Ratified
Sheriffs
Vetoed
Weapons
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
14 | 415.16 | (n/a) | Citation Text |