NC H489 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - Ch. SL 2021-121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - Ch. SL 2021-121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
2021 Building Code and Dev. Reg. Reform
Title
2021 Building Code and Dev. Reg. Reform
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] | Rep. Destin Hall [R] | Rep. Howard Hunter [D] |
Rep. James Adams [R] | Rep. John Bradford [R] | Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] |
Rep. Steve Tyson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-19 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2021-08-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-17 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 80 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-08-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-17 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 80 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-30 | Ch. SL 2021-121 | |
2021-08-30 | Signed by Gov. 8/30/2021 | |
2021-08-24 | Pres. To Gov. 8/24/2021 | |
2021-08-23 | Ratified | |
2021-08-19 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-08-19 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2021-08-19 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-08-19 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-08-19 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/16/2021 |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-08-03 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2021-08-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-04-19 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-19 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-05 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government - Land Use, Planning and Development, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S478 (Same As) 2021-04-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Boards
Building Code Council
Building Codes
Buildings
Chaptered
Commissions
Construction
Councils
Criminal Records
Education
Employment
Environment
Environmental Management Comn.
Erosion
General Contractors Board
Housing
Infrastructure
Licensing & Certification
Local Government
Occupations
Personnel
Presented
Professional Education
Public
Ratified
Records
Session Laws
Soils
Utilities
Water & Sewer Systems
Administrative Rules
Boards
Building Code Council
Building Codes
Buildings
Chaptered
Commissions
Construction
Councils
Criminal Records
Education
Employment
Environment
Environmental Management Comn.
Erosion
General Contractors Board
Housing
Infrastructure
Licensing & Certification
Local Government
Occupations
Personnel
Presented
Professional Education
Public
Ratified
Records
Session Laws
Soils
Utilities
Water & Sewer Systems
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
113A | 54.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
113A | 54.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
113A | 60 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
113A | 61.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
136 | 102.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 136 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 138 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 19 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 21.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 21.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 21.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 306 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160D | 1104 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160D | 922 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
87 | 10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
87 | 10.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
87 | 13.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |