NC H481 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Ch. SL 2021-116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Firearm Disposal/UNC Campus Police

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearm Disposal/UNC Campus Police

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-18 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1, 2, 3 (Y: 93 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-23 Ch. SL 2021-116
2021-08-23 Signed by Gov. 8/23/2021
2021-08-20 Pres. To Gov. 8/20/2021
2021-08-19 Ratified
2021-08-18HouseOrdered Enrolled
2021-08-18HouseConcurred In S Amend SA3
2021-08-18HouseConcurred In S Amend SA2
2021-08-18HouseConcurred In S Amend SA1
2021-08-16HousePlaced On Cal For 08/18/2021
2021-08-16HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2021-08-12HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2021-08-11HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
2021-08-11SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-08-10SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-08-10SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-08-10SenateAmend Adopted A3
2021-08-10SenateAmend Adopted A2
2021-08-10SenateAmend Adopted A1
2021-08-09SenateReptd Fav
2021-06-23SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-23SenateReptd Fav
2021-06-10SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-10SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-06HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-05HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-05HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-04HousePlaced On Cal For 05/05/2021
2021-05-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-04HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-04HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-04HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-04-22HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary 2
2021-04-22HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-05HouseRef to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-05HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
14415.4(n/a)Citation Text
143(n/a)Citation Text
14363.1(n/a)Citation Text
20187.2(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H481
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H481v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H481v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H481v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H481v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H481v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H481v5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50534/0/H481-PCS40402-TC-19
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51189/0/H481-PCS10425-CE-18
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52644/0/H481-ATT-72-V-6
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52649/0/H481-ACE-29-V-3
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52648/0/H481-ACE-30-V-2
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52728/0/H481-A-NBC-9117
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52729/0/H481-A-NBC-9118
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52730/0/H481-A-NBC-9119
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H481-SMTC-58(CSTC-19)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H481-SMTC-59(CSTC-19)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H481-SMCE-55(CSCE-18)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H481-SMCE-60(e2)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H481-SMCE-85(e3)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H481-SMCE-88(e3)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/171
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/378
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/377
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/376
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/375
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/470

Bill Comments 750

feedback