NC H477 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Behav. Health Crisis EMS Transports/Medicaid
Title
Behav. Health Crisis EMS Transports/Medicaid
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2017-05-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-27 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S383 (Same As) 2017-06-13 - Re-ref Com On Health