NC H476 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Ch. SL 2021-148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Judges in Stanly/Montgomery Counties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judges in Stanly/Montgomery Counties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-10 Ch. SL 2021-148
2021-09-10 Signed by Gov. 9/10/2021
2021-09-02 Pres. To Gov. 9/2/2021
2021-09-01 Ratified
2021-08-31SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-08-31SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-08-31SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-08-30SenateReptd Fav
2021-08-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-25SenateReptd Fav
2021-08-17SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-08-05SenateRe-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-05SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-11SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-11HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-10HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-10HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-06HousePlaced On Cal For 05/10/2021
2021-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-06HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-01HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-31HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7A133(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H476
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H476v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H476v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H476v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H476v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H476v4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51481/0/H476-PCS10464-TU-12
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H476-SMTG-64(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H476-SMBV-88(e2)-v-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H476-SMBK-41(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H476-SMBK-42(e2)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/255
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/431

Bill Comments

feedback