NC H471 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Ch. SL 2020-85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempt Direct Primary Care from DOI Regs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempt Direct Primary Care from DOI Regs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Ch. SL 2020-85
2020-07-01 Signed by Gov. 7/1/2020
2020-06-26 Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2020
2020-06-26 Ratified
2020-06-25HouseOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-25HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2020-06-25HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-06-25HouseWithdrawn From Com
2020-06-17HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2020-06-16HousePlaced On Cal For 06/17/2020
2020-06-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-06-16HouseWithdrawn From Com
2020-06-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-08HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2020-06-08SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2020-06-03SenateEngrossed
2020-06-03SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-03SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-03SenateAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-02SenateReptd Fav
2020-05-28SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-05-28SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-05-28SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-27SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-27SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-17SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-17SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-17HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-15HousePlaced On Cal For 04/16/2019
2019-04-15HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-15HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-09HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-09HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-28HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-26HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback