NC H470 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Ch. SL 2019-243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Administration of Justice Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administration of Justice Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-31 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-10-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - A1 Adcock Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06 Ch. SL 2019-243
2019-11-06 Signed by Gov. 11/6/2019
2019-11-01 Pres. To Gov. 11/1/2019
2019-10-31 Ratified
2019-10-31HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-10-31SenateConf Report Adopted
2019-10-31HouseConf Report Adopted
2019-10-31HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-10-31HouseConf Com Reported
2019-10-31SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-10-31SenateConf Com Reported
2019-10-29SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-10-29HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-10-24HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2019-10-24HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-10-24HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-10-17HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-10-14HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-10-14SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-10-10SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-10SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-09SenateReptd Fav
2019-10-09SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-10-09SenateReptd Fav
2019-10-09SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-10-09SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-10-09SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-10-07SenateSequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Added
2019-10-07SenateSequential Referral To Finance Added
2019-10-07SenateSequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Stricken
2019-05-20SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-15SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-15SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-15SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-11HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-04-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-11HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-04-09HousePlaced On Cal For 04/11/2019
2019-04-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-08HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-03HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-03HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-28HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S490 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H470
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H470v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H470v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H470v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H470v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H470v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H470v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/154
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/153
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/610
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/862
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/647
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/899

Bill Comments

feedback