NC H464 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-10)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Small Business Health Care Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business Health Care Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-29HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-11HouseRe-ref Com On Health
2019-04-11HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-02HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
2019-04-02HouseSerial Referral To Health Added
2019-04-02HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-03-28HouseRef to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-26HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback