NC H461 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

MH/SA Central Assessment & Navigation Pilot

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MH/SA Central Assessment & Navigation Pilot

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2017-05-10HouseReptd Fav
2017-03-27HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations
2017-03-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S334 (Same As) 2017-04-10 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback