NC H450 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Future Ready Student Act of 2017
Title
Future Ready Student Act of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - A1 Clampitt Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - A1 Clampitt Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/06/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/05/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - Community Colleges |
2017-03-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Education - Community Colleges |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Filed |