NC H447 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Ch. SL 2021-156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Ch. SL 2021-156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
The Jeff Rieg Law/Patients Religious Rights
Title
The Jeff Rieg Law/Patients Religious Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-16 | Ch. SL 2021-156 | |
2021-09-16 | Signed by Gov. 9/16/2021 | |
2021-09-07 | Pres. To Gov. 9/7/2021 | |
2021-09-03 | Ratified | |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-20 | House | Re-ref Com On State Government |
2021-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-31 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-31 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-30 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
Health Services
Hospitals
Named Laws
Patient Rights
Presented
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Ratified
Religion & Religious Institutions
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
Health Services
Hospitals
Named Laws
Patient Rights
Presented
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Ratified
Religion & Religious Institutions
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
131E | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
131E | 84.05 | (n/a) | Citation Text |