NC H445 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School Calendar Flexibility/Chatham County
Title
School Calendar Flexibility/Chatham County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Local Government |
2021-04-13 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-31 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-31 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-29 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Calendar
Chatham County
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Secondary Education
Calendar
Chatham County
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Secondary Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 84.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |