NC H434 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - Ch. SL 2017-181
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Coins/Currency/Bullion Sales Tax Exemption

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coins/Currency/Bullion Sales Tax Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-25 Ch. SL 2017-181
2017-07-25 Signed by Gov. 7/25/2017
2017-06-28 Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017
2017-06-28 Ratified
2017-06-27SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-27SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-27SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-26SenateReptd Fav
2017-06-21SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-21SenateReptd Fav
2017-06-01SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-01SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-05-25SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-05-25SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-05-25SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-05-24HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-05-23HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-05-23HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-05-18HousePlaced On Cal For 05/23/2017
2017-05-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-05-16HouseReptd Fav
2017-03-23HouseRef To Com On Finance
2017-03-23HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-22HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback