NC H427 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Firearm Safe Storage Awareness Initiative
Title
Firearm Safe Storage Awareness Initiative
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-14 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-14 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-29 | House | Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Filed |