NC H427 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Ch. SL 2013-177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Ch. SL 2013-177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Middlesex/Extend Mayor's Term to Four Years
Title
Middlesex/Extend Mayor's Term to Four Years
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Ch. SL 2013-177 | |
2013-06-20 | Ratified | |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/23/2013 |
2013-04-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-27 | House | Ref To Com On Government |
2013-03-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-26 | House | Filed |