NC H425 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Development Regulations/Multijurisdiction
Title
Development Regulations/Multijurisdiction
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Rep. Larry Potts [R] | Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] | Rep. William Richardson [D] |
Rep. Jerry Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-04-22 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/21/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-29 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government - Land Use, Planning and Development, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
160D | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
160D | 203 | (n/a) | Citation Text |