NC H420 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Ch. SL 2017-59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Ch. SL 2017-59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rockingham Cty Tourism Development Authority
Title
Rockingham Cty Tourism Development Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Bert Jones [R] | Rep. Kyle Hall [R] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Ch. SL 2017-59 | |
2017-06-28 | Ratified | |
2017-06-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-28 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017 |
2017-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-27 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/21/2017 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-04-05 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Job Development |
2017-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-22 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Commerce and Job Development |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Filed |