NC H416 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Failed 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Failed 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Robeson County/Local Business Preference
Title
Robeson County/Local Business Preference
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Graham [D] | Rep. Garland Pierce [D] | Rep. Kenneth Goodman [D] | Rep. Brenden Jones [R] |
Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 66 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A3 Torbett Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A2 Collins Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A1 Graham, C. Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - M8 Re-Refer Rules, Cal., & Operations of the House Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - Motion 12/Add Cal Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A3 Torbett Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A2 Collins Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A1 Graham, C. Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - M8 Re-Refer Rules, Cal., & Operations of the House Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - Motion 12/Add Cal Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Failed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2017-04-26 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2017-04-26 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-24 | House | Serial Referral To Regulatory Reform Stricken |
2017-03-22 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Regulatory Reform |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S277 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate