NC H415 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Ch. SL 2017-50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Ch. SL 2017-50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hatteras Village Community Center District
Title
Hatteras Village Community Center District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Ch. SL 2017-50 | |
2017-06-26 | Ratified | |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/21/2017 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-04-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-22 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Finance |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S282 (Same As) 2017-03-22 - Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate