NC H415 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Ch. SL 2015-85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Ch. SL 2015-85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fontana Dam/Establish Electric Power Board
Title
Fontana Dam/Establish Electric Power Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Ch. SL 2015-85 | |
2015-06-18 | Ratified | |
2015-06-17 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-17 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-06-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2015 |
2015-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-06-11 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-01 | House | Ref To Com On Local Government |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | Filed |