NC H414 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Hearing: Apr 25 @ 10:00 am in 1228/1327 LB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Regional Water Systems and State Grants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional Water Systems and State Grants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S320 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Placed On Cal For 04/29/2019

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback