NC H411 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modify School Qual./Student Success Indicator
Title
Modify School Qual./Student Success Indicator
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Sen. Kevin Corbin [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Elmore [R] | Rep. Linda Johnson [R] |
Rep. Rena Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Ch. SL 2019-142 | |
2019-07-19 | Signed by Gov. 7/19/2019 | |
2019-07-11 | Pres. To Gov. 7/11/2019 | |
2019-07-10 | Ratified | |
2019-07-09 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-09 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2019-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2019 |
2019-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-06-27 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/10/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S412 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate