NC H410 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Credit Union Update
Title
Credit Union Update
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 85 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-19 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2023-03-20 | House | Ref to the Com on Banking, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-16 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
54 | 109.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.16 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.17 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.18 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.18A | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.19 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.21 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.26 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.27 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.28 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.29 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.30 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.31 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.82 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
54 | 109.92 | (n/a) | Citation Text |