NC H406 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-11-29 - Ordered Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Spec. Sep. Allowance/Certain 25-Yr LEOs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Spec. Sep. Allowance/Certain 25-Yr LEOs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-29HouseOrdered Enrolled
2021-11-29HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2021-11-29HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-11-29HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-11-29HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2021-11-29SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2021-11-29SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-11-29SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-11-29SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2021-11-29SenateReptd Fav
2021-11-29SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-11-29SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-11-29SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-11-24SenateRe-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-11-24SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-29SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-04-29HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-04-28HouseOrdered Engrossed
2021-04-28HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-28HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-28HouseAmend Adopted A1
2021-04-28HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-04-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-04-28HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-27HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-13HouseRe-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement
2021-04-13HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-29HouseRef to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-29HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12827(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H406
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H406v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H406v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H406v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H406v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H406v4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50120/0/H406-PCS10266-BAp-10
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50821/0/H406-ATUP-10-V-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/53519/0/H406-PCS10548-BCp-58
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H406-SMBA-20(e1)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H406-SMBC-44(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H406-SMBC-53(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H406-SMBC-162(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H406-SMBC-163(e4)-v-1

Bill Comments

feedback