NC H404 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Ch. SL 2021-181
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Ch. SL 2021-181
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Ltd. Immunity for PSAP/TC for S.L. 2021-171
Title
Ltd. Immunity for PSAP/TC for S.L. 2021-171
Sponsors
Rep. Walter Zachary [R] | Rep. Harry Warren [R] | Rep. Mike Clampitt [R] | Rep. George Cleveland [R] |
Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Marcia Morey [D] | Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] | Rep. Carson Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-04 - Senate - Conference Report Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-18 | Ch. SL 2021-181 | |
2021-11-18 | Signed by Gov. 11/18/2021 | |
2021-11-09 | Pres. To Gov. 11/9/2021 | |
2021-11-08 | Ratified | |
2021-11-04 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2021-11-03 | House | Conf Report #2 Adopted |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 11/04/2021 |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2021-11-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 11/03/2021 |
2021-11-02 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-11-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-11-02 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2021-09-15 | House | Returned to the Conference Committee |
2021-09-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-09-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-09-14 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-09-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/15/2021 |
2021-09-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2021-09-08 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-07-15 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-07-15 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2021-07-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-07-15 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-07-14 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Civil Actions
Commissions
Courts
Emergency Services
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Liability
Personnel
Presented
Public
Ratified
Sheriff's Training Comn.
Sheriffs
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Civil Actions
Commissions
Courts
Emergency Services
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Liability
Personnel
Presented
Public
Ratified
Sheriff's Training Comn.
Sheriffs
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
122C | 32 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
131D | 7.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
131E | 112.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
131E | 207.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
131E | 79.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143B | 1413 | (n/a) | Citation Text |