NC H402 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-21 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Begin Modernizing Ignition Interlock Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Begin Modernizing Ignition Interlock Laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-21SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-09-21SenateReptd Fav
2021-09-09SenateRe-ref Com On Transportation
2021-09-09SenateReptd Fav
2021-09-03SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-09-03SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-12SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-12SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-12SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-11HouseOrdered Engrossed
2021-05-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-11HouseAmend Adopted A1
2021-05-11HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-05-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-11HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-11HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-04-14HouseRe-ref Com On Transportation
2021-04-14HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-25HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-25HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S183 (Same As) 2021-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20(n/a)Citation Text
2017.8(n/a)Citation Text
20179.3(n/a)Citation Text
20179.5(n/a)Citation Text
2019(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H402
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H402v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H402v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H402v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H402v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H402v4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50180/0/H402-PCS10273-SA-11
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51621/0/H402-PCS40603-SU-16
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51757/0/H402-ASU-19-V-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H402-SMSA-21(CSSA-11)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H402-SMSU-28(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H402-SMSU-31(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H402-SMSU-49(e4)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/290

Bill Comments 750

feedback