NC H400 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus Labor Law Changes
Title
Omnibus Labor Law Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - House - Motion 12 / Appeal Ruling of Chair Second Reading (Y: 55 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - A2 Rogers Second Reading (Y: 88 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - A2 Rogers Second Reading (Y: 88 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2019-05-06 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-06 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2019-05-06 | House | Amendment Ruled Out of Order A1 |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2019 |
2019-05-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-05-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2019-04-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Filed |